Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0329 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 19, 2023
Analysis May 18, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 10, 2023
Analysis February 24, 2023
Analysis February 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 24, 2023