Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0341 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 6, 2023
Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 24, 2023