Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0359 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 31, 2023
Analysis May 12, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis February 23, 2023
Analysis February 15, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 24, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023