Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0399 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023