|
06/16/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-227
|
|
|
|
06/12/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/05/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Substituted for SB 702
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 110, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Favorable by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported out of Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable by Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Added to Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Now in Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred to Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|