House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | CS Filed | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Reported out of Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Favorable with CS by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Added to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | Filed |