Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0431 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 25, 2023
Analysis May 18, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 30, 2023