|
05/25/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-124
|
|
|
|
05/24/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/23/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Substituted for CS/SB 522
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 116, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 484355 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|