Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0441 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 21, 2023
Analysis May 30, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 12, 2023
Analysis February 24, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023