House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Education & Employment Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 1 (Ch. 2023-16) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Now in Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Reported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Referred to Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | Filed |