House | 05/05/2023 | Died on Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Reported out of Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Favorable by Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Added to Commerce Committee agenda | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Now in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Favorable by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | Filed |