Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0489 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 17, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis February 23, 2023
Analysis February 20, 2023