House
|
05/02/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 596 (Ch. 2023-218)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Original reference removed: Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported out of Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Added to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Now in Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|