Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Received | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | In Messages | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Passed; YEAS 105, NAYS 0 | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023) | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Reported out of Commerce Committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Favorable by Commerce Committee (Amended) | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Added to Commerce Committee agenda | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Now in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Favorable by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Filed |