Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0523 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 25, 2023