Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0531 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023