Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0537 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 1, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 9, 2023