House
|
05/01/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1002 (Ch. 2023-136)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee (Amended)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
PCS added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|