Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0583 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 12, 2023
Analysis May 23, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 16, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis April 2, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 4, 2023