Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0589 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2023

                               
 
HB 589  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb0589-00 
Page 1 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
A bill to be entitled 1 
An act relating to the Task Force on Workforce Housing 2 
for Teachers and Expansion of Schools; providing 3 
legislative findings; creating the task force adjunct 4 
to the Department of Economic Opportunity; requiring 5 
the department to provide administrative and staff 6 
support; specifying the purpose and the composition of 7 
the task force; defining the term "workforce housing"; 8 
specifying the duties of the task force; r equiring the 9 
task force to submit a report to the Governor and the 10 
Legislature by a specified date; requiring state 11 
agencies to assist and cooperate with the task force; 12 
encouraging local governments to assist and cooperate 13 
with the task force; providing f or expiration of the 14 
task force; providing an effective date. 15 
  16 
Be It Enacted by the Legislature of the State of Florida: 17 
 18 
 Section 1.  (1)  The Legislature finds that recent rapid 19 
increases in the median purchase price of homes and the cost of 20 
rental housing have far outpaced the income of teachers in this 21 
state, preventing essential teachers from living in the 22 
communities where they serve and thereby creating the need for 23 
innovative solutions for the provision of housing opportunities 24 
for teachers. The Legislature further finds that there is a need 25     
 
HB 589  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb0589-00 
Page 2 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
for additional classrooms and instructional space for children. 26 
To this end, the Legislature finds that the establishment of the 27 
Task Force on Workforce Housing for Teachers and Expansion of 28 
Schools is an appropriate measure to identify ways to fulfill 29 
this need in communities throughout the state. 30 
 (2)  The Task Force on Workforce Housing for Teachers and 31 
Expansion of Schools, a task force as defined in s. 20.03(8), 32 
Florida Statutes, is created adjunct to the Department of 33 
Economic Opportunity to study issues related to the need for 34 
affordable housing for teachers and for additional classrooms 35 
and instructional space and to identify the best means of 36 
meeting those needs. Except as otherwise provided in thi s 37 
section, the task force shall operate in a manner consistent 38 
with s. 20.052, Florida Statutes. The department shall provide 39 
administrative and staff support relating to the functions of 40 
the task force. 41 
 (3)  The task force is composed of the following me mbers, 42 
who shall be appointed no later than August 1, 2023: 43 
 (a)  The President of the Senate and the Speaker of the 44 
House of Representatives shall each appoint five members, none 45 
of whom may be a member of the Legislature at the time of his or 46 
her appointment, as follows: 47 
 1.  One member of a board of county commissioners; 48 
 2.  One member of a governing body of a municipality; 49 
 3.  One member of a district school board; 50     
 
HB 589  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb0589-00 
Page 3 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
 4.  A developer; and 51 
 5.  A homebuilder. 52 
 (b)  The Governor shall appoint two members, one of whom is 53 
an affordable housing advocate who may not have a current or 54 
past direct business relationship with any local government, 55 
district school board, developer, or homebuilder. The Governor 56 
shall designate one of his or her appointees as chair o f the 57 
task force. 58 
 (c)  One member of the Senate, appointed by the President 59 
of the Senate. 60 
 (d)  One member of the House of Representatives, appointed 61 
by the Speaker of the House of Representatives. 62 
 (e)  The Commissioner of Education or his or her design ee. 63 
 (f)  The Secretary of Environmental Protection or his or 64 
her designee. 65 
 (g)  The Secretary of Economic Opportunity or his or her 66 
designee. 67 
 (h)  The Secretary of Management Services or his or her 68 
designee. 69 
 70 
The chair of the task force may request that representatives of 71 
appropriate federal agencies participate as ex officio, 72 
nonvoting members. 73 
 (4)  For purposes of this section, the term "workforce 74 
housing" means housing affordable to natural persons or famil ies 75     
 
HB 589  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb0589-00 
Page 4 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
whose total annual household income does not exceed 80 percent 76 
of the area median income, adjusted for household size. 77 
 (5)  The task force shall: 78 
 (a)  Study the feasibility of using surplus, state -owned 79 
land and buildings for workforce housing for te achers and 80 
classroom and instructional space for students. 81 
 (b)  Identify the costs associated with the development of 82 
surplus, state-owned land and buildings for workforce housing 83 
for teachers and additional classroom and instructional space, 84 
including costs arising out of potential partnerships between 85 
state government, local governments, and the private sector. 86 
 (c)  Identify the need and availability of grants for 87 
workforce housing for teachers and additional classroom and 88 
instructional space for studen ts. 89 
 (d)  Identify the areas of this state which have the 90 
greatest need for workforce housing for teachers and additional 91 
classroom and instructional space for students. 92 
 (e)  Study the use of mixed -use developments in addressing 93 
the need for workforce hou sing for teachers and additional 94 
classroom and instructional space for students. 95 
 (f)  Study the need for comprehensive planning that 96 
addresses the need for workforce housing for teachers and 97 
additional classroom and instructional space for students. 98 
 (g)  Determine whether the creation of a pilot program is 99 
necessary and appropriate to achieve the objectives of the task 100     
 
HB 589  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb0589-00 
Page 5 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
force. 101 
 (h)  Identify any statutory changes necessary to achieve 102 
the objectives of the task force. 103 
 (6)  The task force shall submit a rep ort of its findings 104 
and recommendations to the Governor, the President of the 105 
Senate, and the Speaker of the House of Representatives by 106 
February 1, 2024. 107 
 (7)  All state agencies shall cooperate with and assist the 108 
task force to the fullest extent possibl e. All local governments 109 
are encouraged to assist and cooperate with the task force, as 110 
necessary. 111 
 (8)  This section expires July 1, 2024. 112 
 Section 2.  This act shall take effect July 1, 2023. 113