Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0599 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 2, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 13, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 12, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2023