House | 05/01/2023 | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 768 (Ch. 2023-251) | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 04/23/2023 | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Now in Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Favorable by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Filed |