Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0601 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 19, 2023
Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 23, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023