|
06/27/2023
|
Vetoed by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/26/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Substituted for CS/CS/SB 504
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 107, NAYS 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Amendment 477547 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/13/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|