Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0605 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 28, 2023
Analysis May 18, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 12, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 7, 2023