Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0615 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill April 5, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023