House
|
05/05/2023
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|