Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0617 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 16, 2023