|
05/25/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-126
|
|
|
|
05/24/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/23/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Substituted for SB 546
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Favorable by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Reported out of Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Favorable by Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Now in Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|