LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
H0641
Draft Versions
FL
Florida House Bill H0641
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2023 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H0641
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 7, 2023
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
April 27, 2023
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
May 30, 2023
Analysis
May 1, 2023
Analysis
March 27, 2023
Analysis
March 23, 2023
Analysis
March 15, 2023
Analysis
March 13, 2023