House
|
05/01/2023
|
Laid on table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 726 (Ch. 2023-179)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|