|
05/26/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-148
|
|
|
|
05/25/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/23/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Concurred in House amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) (855607)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 112, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Amendment 463652 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Amendment 855607 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment(s) adopted (463652)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Substituted for CS/CS/SB 510
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Original reference removed: Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
PCS added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|