Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0667 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 8, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 1, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis May 4, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 30, 2023