Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0677 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill March 15, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023