House
|
05/02/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 478 (Ch. 2023-168)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Reported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported out of Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Added to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Now in Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|