Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0703 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 5, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 22, 2023