House
|
04/25/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 666 (Ch. 2023-46)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Substituted CS/SB 666
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Reported out of Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Now in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|