Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0707 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis May 9, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 14, 2023