Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Died in Fiscal Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2502 (Ch. 2023-240)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 108, NAYS 7
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable with CS by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|