Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0721 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 31, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill March 15, 2023