|
05/15/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-78
|
|
|
|
05/12/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/09/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Substituted for SB 1112
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 92, NAYS 20
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/30/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Reported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Reported out of Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Favorable by Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Now in Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|