House
|
05/03/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 766 (Ch. 2023-171)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Substituted CS/CS/SB 766
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 075663 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Reported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported out of Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
PCS added to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|