Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0741 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 6, 2023
Analysis May 9, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 19, 2023
Bill March 24, 2023