House
|
05/05/2023
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Favorable by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2023
|
Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|