House
|
05/02/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 226 (Ch. 2023-213)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
PCS added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda - Temporarily Postponed [House Rule 7.11(d)]
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|