Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0813 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 20, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 28, 2023
Bill March 15, 2023