House
|
05/05/2023
|
Died in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Reported out of Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Favorable by Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Added to Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Now in Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|