Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0827 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023