|
06/06/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-198
|
|
|
|
06/05/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/23/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Substituted for SB 938
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 108, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/13/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Favorable by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|