Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0829 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 7, 2023
Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023